Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Fogarty, Colleen, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Nasby, Russell, in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with ZAMBRANO, RAUL presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeZAMBRANO, RAUL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2008 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2009 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE-NO SUPPORT - Recorded (OR.2363.1044. / 2019022420) | |
February 10, 2009 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND WAIVER RUSSELL NASBY (RESPONDENT); | |
February 10, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS (PROPOSED FINAL JUDGMENT) | |
December 29, 2008 | Docket Event | CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF NOTIFICATION | |
December 29, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDGE ZAMBRANO/ Pages: 1 | |
December 29, 2008 | Docket Event | DR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE RECEIPT: 67205 DATE: 12/29/2008/ Pages: 1 | |
December 23, 2008 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
December 23, 2008 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.