Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Schneiter, Thomas Martin, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Schneiter, Jodi Renee, in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with ZAMBRANO, RAUL presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeZAMBRANO, RAUL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2008 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 12, 2009 | Docket Event | CIRC CIV CERTIFICATION & COPIES FEE RECEIPT: 88285 DATE: 08/12/2009/ Pages: 1 | |
March 03, 2009 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE - NO SUPPORT - Recorded (OR.2363.1015. / 2019022416) | |
February 18, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS DAWN D. NICHOLS (ATTORNEY) ON BEHALF OF THOMAS MARTIN SCHNEITER (PETITIONER)/ Pages: 3 | |
February 18, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING/ MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT | |
February 04, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING OF CERT OF COMPLETION DAWN D. NICHOLS (ATTORNEY) ON BEHALF OF THOMAS MARTIN SCHNEITER (PETITIONER) | |
January 29, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING OF CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION - PARENTING CLASS DAWN D. NICHOLS (ATTORNEY) ON BEHALF OF THOMAS MARTIN SCHNEITER (PETITIONER) | |
January 20, 2009 | Docket Event | ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE JODI RENEE SCHNEITER (RESPONDENT); | |
December 29, 2008 | Docket Event | DR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE RECEIPT: 67198 DATE: 12/29/2008/ Pages: 1 | |
December 29, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDGE ZAMBRANO/ Pages: 1 | |
December 29, 2008 | Docket Event | CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF NOTIFICATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.