Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gauthier, William Allen, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with HAMMOND, KIM C presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHAMMOND, KIM C Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2008 |
CategorySummary Administration Over 1000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 18, 2009 | Docket Event | PROB CERTIFICATION & COPIES RECEIPT: 72160 DATE: 02/18/2009 RECEIPT: 72161 DATE: 02/18/2009/ Pages: 1 | |
January 06, 2009 | Docket Event | TO RECORDING NO. 3/ Pages: 1 | |
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMIN/BK:1697 PG:848/ Pages: 2 | |
December 30, 2008 | Docket Event | NON REFUND OVERPAY < $5 RECEIPT: 67423 DATE: 12/30/2008 RECEIPT 67423 REVERSED BY 72158 ON 02/18/2009./ Pages: 1 | |
December 30, 2008 | Docket Event | FEE PD FOR CERT. COPY .50 SHORT/ Pages: 1 | |
December 29, 2008 | Docket Event | PROB FILING FEE SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION > $1000 RECEIPT: 67422 DATE: 12/30/2008/ Pages: 1 | |
December 29, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KIM C. HAMMOND/ Pages: 1 | |
December 29, 2008 | Docket Event | DEATH CERTIFICATE/ Pages: 1 | |
December 29, 2008 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION/ Pages: 3 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.