Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Blackwood, Norman, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with KIM C. HAMMOND presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKIM C. HAMMOND Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2008 |
CategoryFormal Administration |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
September 27, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISCHARGE OR BK 1836 PG 502 | |
September 16, 2011 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION | |
September 16, 2011 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF INVENTORY | |
July 29, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER REGARDING PETITION | |
July 14, 2011 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF ACCTG & CONSENT TO DISCHARGE | |
July 14, 2011 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR DISCHARGE | |
July 14, 2011 | Docket Event | STATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS | |
June 03, 2011 | Docket Event | HEARING SET FOR 09/23/2011 AT 1:30 PM IN 403/ , JDG: SMITH III, C MCFERRIN | |
June 03, 2011 | Docket Event | MOTION NOTICE AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.