Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Baumgartel, Kurt, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Simoes, Kimberly P, against Baliker, Paul, in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with CRAIG, DENNIS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCRAIG, DENNIS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryOther Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2015 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED UNDELIVERED - KURT BAUMGARTEL | |
January 02, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DESTRUCTION OF EVIDENCE/EXHIBITS-NO RESPONSE - EVIDENCE TO SHRED | |
June 29, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER ON MOTION TOWITHDRAW AS COUNSEL | |
June 28, 2011 | Docket Event | SUSAN W TOLBERT PL'S NOTICE OF COST LIEN | |
June 28, 2011 | Docket Event | SUSAN W TOLBERT PL'S MOTIONTO WITHDRAW | |
June 28, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING | |
June 28, 2011 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE FROM KURT BAUMGARTEL | |
June 15, 2011 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $0.00 RECEIPT #2011011603 | |
June 01, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING | |
June 01, 2011 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.