Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hsbc Bank Usa National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Van Ness, J Anthony, against Unknown Tenant #2 In Possession, Unknown Tenants In Possession, Any And All Unknown Parties, Unknown Spse Of Thomas, Roy, Unknown Spse Of Andreone, Susan, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with ZAMBRANO, RAUL presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeZAMBRANO, RAUL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2008 |
CategoryReal Prop/Mort Foreclosure (Pre2010) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 01, 2015 | Docket Event | IMAGE(S) DESTROYED PER F.R.J.A. 2.430 AND/OR GS11 | |
July 28, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS/ Pages: 1 | |
July 16, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS/ Pages: 2 | |
July 13, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-NONSERVED ROY UNKNOWN SPSE OF THOMAS (DEFENDANT);/ Pages: 2 | |
July 13, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-SERVED-7/3/09 ROY THOMAS (DEFENDANT);/ Pages: 2 | |
July 13, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-SERVED-7/03/09 SUSAN ANDREONE (DEFENDANT);/ Pages: 2 | |
July 13, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-NONSERVED SUSAN UNKNOWN SPSE OF ANDREONE (DEFENDANT);/ Pages: 2 | |
June 22, 2009 | Docket Event | PLURIES SUMMONS ISSUED ROY UNKNOWN SPSE OF THOMAS (DEFENDANT);/ Pages: 2 | |
June 22, 2009 | Docket Event | CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEES (SUMMONS) RECEIPT: 83805 DATE: 06/22/2009/ Pages: 4 | |
June 22, 2009 | Docket Event | PLURIES SUMMONS ISSUED SUSAN ANDREONE (DEFENDANT);/ Pages: 2 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.