Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Unkn Tenant In Possession, Etienne, Ricot A, Alexis, Gabrielle M, in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with ZAMBRANO, RAUL presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeZAMBRANO, RAUL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2008 |
CategoryReal Prop/Mort Foreclosure (Pre2010) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2010 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET/ Pages: 1 | |
August 02, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS OR BK 1778 PG 1571 | |
July 09, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FAILURE TO PROSECUTE | |
August 05, 2009 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION RICOT A ETIENNE (DEFENDANT);/ Pages: 1 | |
July 06, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ACTION - 8/25/09 - RICOT A ETIENNE PUBLISHED 2X 7/25/09 & 8/1/09 FAXED TO NJ/ Pages: 1 | |
May 13, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER CORRECTING SCRIVENER'S ERROR/ Pages: 2 | |
April 06, 2009 | Docket Event | EX-PARTE MOTION TO CORRECT SCHRIVERNER'S ERROR/ Pages: 1 | |
April 02, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF DURE AND DILIGENT SEARCH/ Pages: 6 | |
April 02, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE/ Pages: 1 | |
March 23, 2009 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE FROM GABRIELLE M ALEXIS (DEFENDANT); |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.