Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wachovia Mortgage Fsb, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Finch, Brianna, against Any, & All Unkn Parties, Nollman, Scott B, Nollman, Unkn Spouse Of Scott B, Tenant #1, Tenant #2, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with ZAMBRANO, RAUL presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeZAMBRANO, RAUL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2008 |
CategoryReal Prop/Mort Foreclosure (Pre2010) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS/ Pages: 2 | |
March 18, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-NONSERVED 03/17/09 UNKN SPOUSE OF SCOTT B NOLLMAN (DEFENDANT); | |
March 18, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-NONSERVED 03/17/09 TENANT #1 (DEFENDANT); | |
March 18, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-NONSERVED 03/17/09 TENANT #2 (DEFENDANT); | |
January 27, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-SERVED ON 01/22/09 SCOTT B NOLLMAN (DEFENDANT); | |
December 30, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TENANT #2 (DEFENDANT); | |
December 30, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED SCOTT B NOLLMAN (DEFENDANT); | |
December 30, 2008 | Docket Event | CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEES (SUMMONS) RECEIPT: 67406 DATE: 12/30/2008/ Pages: 4 | |
December 30, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED UNKN SPOUSE OF SCOTT B NOLLMAN (DEFENDANT); | |
December 30, 2008 | Docket Event | CIRC CIV ADDITIONAL DEFENDANT > 5 FEE RECEIPT: 69008 DATE: 01/20/2009/ Pages: 2 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.