Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Chase Bank Usa N A, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Orsi, Philip A, against Brannigan, James M Sr, in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with ZAMBRANO, RAUL presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeZAMBRANO, RAUL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2008 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FAILURE TO PROSECUTE/ Pages: 2 | |
May 20, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT JAMES M BRANNIGAN SR (DEFENDANT);/ Pages: 1 | |
March 09, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE/ Pages: 2 | |
January 13, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-SERVED ON 01/12/09 JAMES M BRANNIGAN SR (DEFENDANT); | |
December 29, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED - JAMES M. BRANNIGAN, SR. | |
December 23, 2008 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET CONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS | |
December 23, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDGE ZAMBRANO/ Pages: 1 | |
December 23, 2008 | Docket Event | CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEES (SUMMONS) RECEIPT: 67372 DATE: 12/29/2008/ Pages: 1 | |
December 23, 2008 | Docket Event | CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE OTHER RECEIPT: 67372 DATE: 12/29/2008/ Pages: 1 | |
December 23, 2008 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.