Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Citimortgage Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Bibbins, Celena R, against Jane Doe, John Doe, Bank Of America National Association, Flagler Point Condos, Any, & All Unkn Parties, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with CRAIG, DENNIS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCRAIG, DENNIS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2008 |
CategoryReal Prop/Mort Foreclosure (Pre2010) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2012 | Docket Event | CASE REOPEN FOR RECLOSE | |
January 30, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT POSSESSION - NO WRIT TO SIGN | |
January 09, 2012 | Docket Event | HEARING SET FOR 01/19/2012 AT 9:00 AM IN 402/ , JDG: CRAIG, DENNIS | |
January 05, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
December 28, 2011 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2011024767 | |
December 27, 2011 | Docket Event | CIRC CIV REOPEN FILING FEE ASSESSED $50.00 | |
December 27, 2011 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION - PROP ORDER TO JUDGE | |
December 27, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE REOPENED FOR REOPEN | |
December 12, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE REOPENED FOR REOPEN | |
December 12, 2011 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S (TENANT'S) MOTION TO STAY ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION - SENT TO JUDGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.