Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Citibank N A, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Unkn Persons In Possession, Calderon Lorenzana, Ester J, Lorenzana, Bruce S, in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with CRAIG, DENNIS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCRAIG, DENNIS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2008 |
CategoryReal Prop/Mort Foreclosure (Pre2010) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2013 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURN RECEIPT-NONSERVED- ESTER LORENZANA | |
March 14, 2013 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURN RECEIPT-NONSERVED- BRUCE LORENZANA | |
February 27, 2013 | Docket Event | MAILED DOCUMENTS TO MORRIS/HARDWICK | |
February 21, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER DISMISSING FORECLOSURE ACTION DISSOLVING LIS PENDENS AND DIRECTING CLERK TO RETURN ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE | |
February 21, 2013 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
February 21, 2013 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET | |
February 04, 2013 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS ACITON DISSOLVE LIS PENDENS AND FOR ORDER DIRECTING THE RETURN OF ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE (ORDER TO JUDGE) | |
October 31, 2012 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES | |
June 26, 2012 | Docket Event | NONMILITARY AFFIDAVIT BRUCE S LORENZANA | |
June 26, 2012 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.