Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mohammed, Trisha R, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Mohammed, Jason S, in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with ATACK, SHARON B presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeATACK, SHARON B Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2005 |
CategoryChild Support - Dor |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 27, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT/CERTIFICATE OF DELINQUENCY - Recorded (OR.2289.94. / 2018024027) | |
June 18, 2008 | Docket Event | ADDRESS CHANGE TRISHA R. MOHAMMED (PETITIONER);/ Pages: 1 | |
June 18, 2008 | Docket Event | MOTION TRISHA R. MOHAMMED (PETITIONER);/ Pages: 1 | |
June 12, 2008 | Docket Event | AUDIT | |
June 12, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DELINQUENCY JASON S. MOHAMMED (RESPONDENT); | |
August 08, 2006 | Docket Event | CERT RE DISB OF CHLD SUPT-CS PAYMENTS DIRECT TO PETITIONER | |
July 28, 2006 | Docket Event | FINAL ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT ORDER | |
July 28, 2006 | Docket Event | DEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET | |
December 27, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PROCEEDING TO ESTABLISH ADMIN SUPPORT ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.