Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mccomb, Kristyn, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Mccomb, Chad, in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with ZAMBRANO, RAUL presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeZAMBRANO, RAUL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2005 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | SUPPORT INFORMATION SHEET- COPY MI ORDER | |
November 05, 2019 | Docket Event | SUPPORT INFORMATION SHEET- COPY MI ORDER | |
October 11, 2017 | Docket Event | SUPPORT INFORMATION SHEET W/ COPY OF MI ORDER | |
May 30, 2017 | Docket Event | SUPPORT INFORMATION SHEET W/ COPY OF MI ORDER | |
June 20, 2016 | Docket Event | SUPPORT INFORMATION SHEET W/ COPY OF MI ORDER | |
December 03, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SOC SEC NUMBER | |
December 03, 2015 | Docket Event | DEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET | |
December 03, 2015 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO REDIRECT PAYMENTS TO NEW TITLE IV-D CASE | |
November 23, 2015 | Docket Event | ADDRESS CHANGE - KRISTYN CULLIS | |
April 10, 2014 | Docket Event | EX PARTE MOTION AND ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.