Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Brendel, Lawrence W, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Gregory, Jeanine M, in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with ZAMBRANO, RAUL presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeZAMBRANO, RAUL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2005 |
CategoryOther Domestic Relations |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2006 | Docket Event | FILE TO JUDGE-RAZ/RETURNED 1/30/06 | |
January 23, 2006 | Docket Event | FILE RETURNED | |
January 17, 2006 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE FROM JEANINE M. GREGORY | |
January 17, 2006 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE FROM LAWRENCE BRENDEL | |
January 17, 2006 | Docket Event | FILE TO JUDGE-RAZ/RET'D 1/23/06 | |
January 04, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDER ESTABLISHING VISITATION SCHEDULE | |
January 03, 2006 | Docket Event | FILE TO JUDGE-RAZ/RETURNED 1/4/06 | |
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event | FILE TO MIKE COOK / RETURNED 1/3/06 | |
December 19, 2005 | Docket Event | PETITION TO DOMESTICATE A FOREIGN JUDGMENT | |
December 19, 2005 | Docket Event | ORDER TO PICK-UP MINOR CHILD(REN) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.