Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Trammell, Amanda Lyn, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Broker, Jason Lee Sr., in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with ZAMBRANO, RAUL presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeZAMBRANO, RAUL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 16, 2005 |
CategoryOther Domestic Relations |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event | PARTIAL PAYMENT CONTRACT COMPLETED | |
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event | REC# 5005927 $255.00 FEE CD: AOCF FROM: JOHN MURRAY | |
December 22, 2005 | Docket Event | ORDER TO PICK-UP MINOR CHILD(REN) - Recorded (OR.2442.644. / 2020018204) | |
December 21, 2005 | Docket Event | FILE TO JUDGE-RAZ/RET'D | |
December 16, 2005 | Docket Event | UCCJA AFFIDAVIT- AMANDA LYN TRAMMELL | |
December 16, 2005 | Docket Event | VOIDED 12/16/2005 REC# 5005730 $28.00 FEE CD: AOCF FROM: AMANDA LYN TRAMMELL | |
December 16, 2005 | Docket Event | PARTIAL PAYMENT CONTRACT | |
December 16, 2005 | Docket Event | EMERGENCY VERIFIEDMOTION FOR CHILD PICK-UP ORDER | |
December 16, 2005 | Docket Event | VOIDED 12/16/2005 REC# 5005731 $0.00 FEE CD: AOCF FROM: TRAMMELL | |
December 16, 2005 | Docket Event | CIVIL AFF/APPLICATION FOR INDIGENT STATUS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.