Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gardner, Petrina V, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Roylance, William D, in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with ZAMBRANO, RAUL presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeZAMBRANO, RAUL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 12, 2005 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2006 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF PERIOD TO FILE EXCEPTIONS TO THE GM'S REPORT | |
March 08, 2006 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE-NO SUPPORT - Recorded (OR.2448.208. / 2020021247) | |
March 08, 2006 | Docket Event | REPORT OF FINDINGS AND RECOMM OF THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
March 06, 2006 | Docket Event | FILE TO GEN MAGISTRATE/RETURNED 3/8/06 | |
February 15, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING-BEFORE THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE-3/6/06, @9AM | |
February 03, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
February 02, 2006 | Docket Event | FILE TO MIKE COOK - RTND 2/3/06 | |
January 27, 2006 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT - WILLIAM ROYLANCE | |
January 27, 2006 | Docket Event | DEFAULT - WILLIAM ROYLANCE | |
December 19, 2005 | Docket Event | RET OF SERV-SRVD-12/14/05-WILLIAM D. ROYLANCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.