Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Fabry, Frieda, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with HAMMOND, KIM C presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHAMMOND, KIM C Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2005 |
CategorySummary Administration Over 1000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 12, 2006 | Docket Event | NO. 4 TO RECORDING | |
January 24, 2006 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
January 10, 2006 | Docket Event | REC# 6000025 $3.50 FEE CD: ACER FROM: DENNIS KNOX BAYER | |
December 21, 2005 | Docket Event | ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION PAGES: 0760-/BK:1484 PG:NA | |
December 20, 2005 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION | |
December 20, 2005 | Docket Event | REC# 5001343 $205.00 FEE CD: ASAG FROM: DENNIS KNOX BAYER | |
December 20, 2005 | Docket Event | DEATH CERTIFICATE PAGES: 915 -/BK:1366 PG:NA | |
December 20, 2005 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.