Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wooten, Carol A, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with HAMMOND, KIM C presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHAMMOND, KIM C Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2005 |
CategorySummary Administration Over 1000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 12, 2006 | Docket Event | NOS. 3-6-8 TO RECORDING | |
January 18, 2006 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event | DOC'S 2-5-7 RETURNED FROM RECORDING | |
December 28, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO CREDITORS | |
December 28, 2005 | Docket Event | ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION PAGES: 0756-/BK:1484 PG:NA | |
December 28, 2005 | Docket Event | DOC'S 2-5-7 TO RECORDING | |
December 21, 2005 | Docket Event | ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY PAGES: 715 -/BK:1373 PG:NA | |
December 21, 2005 | Docket Event | ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE PAGES: 0755-/BK:1484 PG:NA | |
December 20, 2005 | Docket Event | REC# 5001341 $208.50 FEE CD: ACER FROM: DONALD W DUNCAN | |
December 19, 2005 | Docket Event | DEATH CERTIFICATE PAGES: 713 -/BK:1373 PG:NA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.