Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Old World Craftsmen, Inc.,, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Barnes, Frederick C, against Arch Insurance Company, represented by Wright, D. Frank, in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with ZAMBRANO, RAUL presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeZAMBRANO, RAUL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2005 |
CategoryReal Prop/Mort Foreclosure (Pre2010) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2006 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
August 18, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HRG-8/16/06 | |
August 16, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY | |
June 01, 2006 | Docket Event | FILE TO JUDGE-RAZ - RTND 06/07/06 | |
May 22, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY -F BARNES, ESQ. | |
May 15, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING--8/16/06 DEF'S MOT TO DISMISS COMPL. ETC | |
April 17, 2006 | Docket Event | ARCH INC CO NTC OF SERV OF ANSWERS TO OLD WORLD, ETC. | |
April 17, 2006 | Docket Event | ARCH INS CO RESPONSES TO OLD WORLD, ETC. REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
March 10, 2006 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NTC OF SERV OF FIRST SET OF INTERROG TO DEF | |
March 10, 2006 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.