Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Tillis, Debra R, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Rotstein, Jonathan Isaac, against Scarisbrick, Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with ZAMBRANO, RAUL presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeZAMBRANO, RAUL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2005 |
CategoryOther Negligence |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 21, 2006 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL | |
November 16, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
September 27, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ADDRESS CHANGE - VASQUEZ & TOSKO ATTY | |
September 13, 2006 | Docket Event | CASE MGMT,ETC.,ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL-1/2/07 | |
September 12, 2006 | Docket Event | FILE TO JUDGE-RAZ - RTND 09/13/06 | |
September 06, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING MEDIATION CONFERENCE-9/28/06 @ 11:30AM | |
September 06, 2006 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT | |
August 25, 2006 | Docket Event | NTC OF FILING/ORG RETURN OF SVS AND SUBP-8/7/06, A. THORNE | |
August 25, 2006 | Docket Event | NTC OF FILING/ORG RTN OF SERVD-8/7/06, DAN WALDRON | |
August 22, 2006 | Docket Event | NTC OF FILING/RET OF SERV/SERV'D KRISTY THORNE -08/11/06 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.