Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
National Recreational Prop., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Golson, William M, against Other, Unkn Parties, Unkn, Tenant #2, Unkn, Tenant #1, Diaz, Bernardo, in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with ZAMBRANO, RAUL presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeZAMBRANO, RAUL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2005 |
CategoryReal Prop/Mort Foreclosure (Pre2010) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2006 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
January 26, 2006 | Docket Event | RET OF SERV-NONSERV-BERNARDO DIAZ | |
January 25, 2006 | Docket Event | RET OF SERV-NONSERV-BERNARDO DIAZ | |
December 20, 2005 | Docket Event | REC# 5005775 $255.00 FEE CD: AOCF FROM: WILLIAM M. GOLSON | |
December 20, 2005 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED -BERNARDO DIAZ | |
December 19, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS PAGES: 1972-PG1/BK:1369 PG:NA | |
December 19, 2005 | Docket Event | MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.