Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Chase Home Finance Llc,, filed a(n) 3 case represented by H.Ford, Richards, against Flagler County Brd Of Cty Comm, Schaller, David R. Ii, Schenck, Donna M, Unkn, Person In Possess, represented by Goan, Timothy M, Sapienza, Stephen P, in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with ZAMBRANO, RAUL presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeZAMBRANO, RAUL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 13, 2005 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedDecember 28, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
|
12/13/2005
Date: December 02, 202312/13/2005
Date: December 01, 20235/31/2006
Date: December 03, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2023 | |||
December 02, 2023 | |||
December 01, 2023 | |||
January 06, 2009 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT/ORDER | |
December 01, 2008 |
JURY TRIAL
Judge: ZAMBRANO, RAUL |
||
November 05, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER ON COUNTER DEF'S MOTION TO STRIKE THE COUNTER-PLS CLAIMS FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES AND ATTY FEES / GRANTED | |
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event | MEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT (CASE SETTLED) | |
October 09, 2008 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND / SECOND AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT STEPHEN SAPIENZA (ATTORNEY) ON BEHALF OF DAVID R. II SCHALLER (DEFENDANT) | |
September 25, 2008 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
September 15, 2008 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - DAVID & CARMEN SCHALLER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.