Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mbna America Bank, N.A.,, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Haro, Sasha, against Masbad, Raymond Francis, in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with ZAMBRANO, RAUL presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeZAMBRANO, RAUL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 12, 2005 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/O PREJ/ Pages: 1 | |
July 24, 2006 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS | |
July 24, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDER ON PL'S MOTION TO PERMIT TELEPHONIC,ETC/GRANTED | |
July 24, 2006 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF INTEREST CALCULATION | |
July 20, 2006 | Docket Event | FILE TO JUDGE-RAZ - RTND 07/24/06 | |
July 19, 2006 | Docket Event | MOTION TO PERMIT TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT HRG | |
July 19, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING-8/16/06-PL'S MOT TO CONFIRM,ETC | |
June 22, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING DEF'S MOT FOR RELIEF FROM ORDER,ETC | |
June 21, 2006 | Docket Event | FILE TO JUDGE-RAZ - RTND 06/22/06 | |
June 12, 2006 | Docket Event | FILE TO JUDGE-RAZ - RTND 06/13/06 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.