Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Florida Agency For Health Care Administration, Williams Yulee, Lanell, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Escambia County. This case was filed in Escambia County Superior Courts Circuit with Kinsey, Jennie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKinsey, Jennie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 27, 2021 |
CategoryProbate - Formal |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationEscambia County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR FILING FINAL ACCOUNTING AND PETITION FOR DISCHARGE | |
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | PETITION TO EXTEND TIME TO CLOSE ESTATE | |
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | COPY | |
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER REQUIRING - CLOSING OF ESTATE | |
November 09, 2022 | Docket Event | STATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS | |
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER REQUIRING - STATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS | |
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO CLOSE ESTATE | |
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event | PETITION TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING FINAL ACCOUNTING AND PETITION FOR DISCHARGE | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | CLAIM ENTERED BY AGENCY FOR HEALTH CARE ADMINISTRATION FOR $ 2606.60 | |
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS - AHCA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.