Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Ascension Sacred Heart Hospital, Escambia County Ems, Mueller, Elizabeth Glass, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Escambia County. This case was filed in Escambia County Superior Courts Circuit with [ U ] BOLES, W. JOEL presiding.
Case Number |
Judge[ U ] BOLES, W. JOEL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 21, 2021 |
CategoryProbate - Formal |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationEscambia County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISCHARGE - Recorded (OR.8824.1078 / 2022073132) | |
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISCHARGE | |
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event | CHECKLIST FOR CLOSING FORMAL ADMIN | |
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR DISCHARGE | |
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event | STATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS | |
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF ACCTING AND SERV OF PFD AND RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE - ELIZABETH MUELLER | |
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event | FLORIDA NON TAX CERTIFICATE/AFFIDAVIT OF NO FL ESTATE TAX | |
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF ACCTING AND SERV OF PFD AND RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE - ALICE GLASS | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (AHCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.