Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mcdaniel, Thelma Clausell, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Escambia County. This case was filed in Escambia County Superior Courts Circuit with Kinsey, Jennie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKinsey, Jennie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 21, 2020 |
CategoryProbate - Formal |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationEscambia County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISCHARGE - Recorded (OR.8874.519 / 2022102146) | |
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISCHARGE | |
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE | |
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event | CHECKLIST FOR CLOSING FORMAL ADMINISTRATION | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE ON AGENCY FOR HLTHCARE | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | STATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS | |
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE AS UNDELIVERABLE | |
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event | INVENTORY | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD PROPERTY - Recorded (OR.8698.928 / 2022002249) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.