Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Rh Opportunities Iii Llc An Oregon Limited Liability Company, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Glass, Michelle L, against Estate Of Archie E Stuart, Perez, Alissa, Phetteplace Sr, James, Phetteplace, Vonda, Stuart, Joy R, (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of Escambia County. This case was filed in Escambia County Superior Courts Circuit with [ F-CIVIL ] BRODERSEN, AMY P. presiding.
Case Number |
Judge[ F-CIVIL ] BRODERSEN, AMY P. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 13, 2021 |
CategoryNon-Homestead Fore $50,001-$249,999 |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationEscambia County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ADDITIONAL ADVANCES
Date: March 17, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF ADDITIONAL ADVANCES
Date: March 17, 2022PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ADDITIONAL ADVANCES
Date: March 17, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event | LETTER DISBURSING FUNDS | |
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event | LETTER DISBURSING FUNDS | |
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $45.00 RECEIPT #2023016205 | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S EXCLUSIVE ASSIGNEE'S MOTION FOR DISBURSEMENT OF SURPLUS AND AEG'S MOTION TO INTERVENE AND FOR DISBURSEMENT OF SURPLUS FUNDS AND PRO SE MOTION FOR SURPLUS FUNDS FROM VONDA PHETTEPLACE AND JAMES PEHTTEPLACE SR | |
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING DEFENDANT’S EXCLUSIVE ASSIGNEE’S MOTION FOR DISBURSEMENT OF SURPLUS AND AEG'S MOTION TO INTERVENE AND FOR DISBURSEMENT OF SURPLUS FUNDS | |
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO INTERVENE AND FOR DISBURSEMENT OF SURPLUS FUNDS | |
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event | CHANGE OF ADDRESS FROM JAMES PHETTERPLACE SR | |
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S EXCLUSIVE ASSIGNEE'S MOTION FOR DISBURSEMENT OF SURPLUS | |
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event | PRO SE MOTION FOR SURPLUS FUNDS FROM VONDA PHETTEPLACE AND JAMES PHETTEPLACE SR. | |
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event | LETTER DISBURSING FUNDS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.