Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Fell, John, Fell, Patricia, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Alexander, Brittany, Pena, Yenisleivys, against Asi Preferred Insurance Corp, represented by Burghardt, Melissa, White, Daniel James, in the jurisdiction of Escambia County. This case was filed in Escambia County Superior Courts Circuit with Bergosh, Gary presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBergosh, Gary Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 14, 2021 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationEscambia County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
COMPLAINT
Date: April 14, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
April 14, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT | |
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY | |
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, JOHN FELL | |
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, PATRICIA FELL | |
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFFS | |
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event | INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER-GENERAL | |
November 11, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND TO DETERMINE THE SEQUENCE OF DEPOSITIONS AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW | |
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.