Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Midfirst Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Brightwell, William A Iv, Woodburn, Lisa A, against Dorion, Deitri Dee, Dorion, Michael, Unknown Tenant In Possession 1, Unknown Tenant In Possession 2, in the jurisdiction of Escambia County. This case was filed in Escambia County Superior Courts Circuit with Nobles, Linda presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNobles, Linda Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 29, 2019 |
CategoryHomestead Foreclosure $50,001-$249,999 |
Last RefreshedDecember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationEscambia County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED
Date: May 21, 2019SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED
Date: May 21, 2019CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: April 29, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2020 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2020045735 | |
July 01, 2020 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE FILED | |
June 23, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER TO VACATE CANCELLATION STAMP PLACED ON ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE BY THE COURT | |
June 23, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER TO VACATE CANCELLATION STAMP PLACED ON ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE BY THE COURT - Recorded (OR.8318.169 / 2020050294) | |
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION TO VACATE CANCELLATION STAMP ON ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE PLACED BY THE COURT AND REESTABLISH ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE | |
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event | FIRST COLLECTIONS NOTICE SENT | |
May 21, 2020 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2020035959 | |
May 19, 2020 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE FILED | |
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF THE ORDER TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE, RELEASE ALL PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBITS FROM EVIDENCE AND ANY AND ALL LOAN DOCUMENTS TO THE PLAINTIFF, DISMISS FORECLOSURE ACTION, AND RELEASE LIS PENDENS | |
May 12, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE, RELEASE ALL PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBITS FROM EVIDENCE AND ANY AND ALL LOAN DOCUMENTS TO THE PLAINTIFF DISMISS FORECLOSURE ACTION, AND RELEASE LIS PENDENS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.