Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Loney, Anthony E, Williamson, Andy Wayne, against Ambo, Rowena P, Unknown Beneficiaries Of The Total Assets Living Trust Dated August 10 2006, Unknown Successor Of Trustee Of The Total Assets Living Trust Dated August 10,2006, Unknown Tenant 1, Unknown Tenant 2, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Escambia County. This case was filed in Escambia County Superior Courts Circuit with Pitre, Stephen A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePitre, Stephen A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 14, 2019 |
CategoryHomestead Foreclosure $50,001-$249,999 |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationEscambia County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
NOTICE OF HEARING NON JURY TRIAL
Date: July 02, 2019CORRESPONDENCE OF ROWENA POOLE
Date: May 02, 2019PROOF OF PUBLICATION
Date: March 28, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE AS UNDELIVERABLE | |
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event | SECOND COLLECTIONS NOTICE SENT | |
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE AS UNDELIVERABLE | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | FIRST COLLECTIONS NOTICE SENT | |
April 27, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT DISMISSING APPEAL DCA# 1D19-3458 | |
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event | RECORD ON APPEAL PREPARED ON 11/8/2019 | |
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event | INVOICE FOR CIVIL APPEAL RECORD PREPARED AND COPIES SENT TO ATTORNEY | |
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event | RECEIPT # 2019091365 MODIFIED: PAYMENT $0.00 | |
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.