Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Carrick Carter filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Probate with BEVERLY, THOMAS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBEVERLY, THOMAS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2020 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseProbate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER DESIGNATING DEPOSITORY | |
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR DESIGNATING DEPOSITORY | |
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S FEE | |
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER AUTHORIZING SALE BOOK 19736 PAGE 1471-1471 | |
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER DESIGNATING DEPOSITORY | |
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 05/19/2021 3:00 PM - 715 CHAMBERS, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202 | |
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | CONSENT | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | CONSENT AND WAIVER OF NOTICE | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $85.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3888213 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.