Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Rad Ekkawi, filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Probate with SCHEMER, JACK M. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSCHEMER, JACK M. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 22, 2020 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseProbate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event | PETITIONER: EKKAWI, RAD | |
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISCHARGE BOOK 20253 PAGE 570-570 | |
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event | REPRESENTATIVE ATTORNEY: HARROD, MATTHEW THOMAS | |
April 15, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK REPORT - APPROVED FOR DISCHARGE | |
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF ACCT & SERV., RECPT BY BENEF. & CONSENT TO DISCHG | |
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR DISCHARGE | |
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD BOOK 19595 PAGE 1633-1634 | |
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET | |
February 12, 2021 | Docket Event | STATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS | |
February 12, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE BOOK 19586 PAGE 467-467 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.