Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Stevie K. Smith, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Conner, Tara Beth, against Migel M. Sirdarius, The Travelers Indemnity Company Of Connecticut, represented by Braswell, Cary Aw, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with DEARING, KATIE L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDEARING, KATIE L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 22, 2020 |
CategoryAuto Negligence Case Division: Cv-B |
Last RefreshedApril 06, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event | CANCELLED JURY SELECTION ON 10/17/2022 9:00:00 AM | |
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event | > CANCEL REASON - DISMISSED | |
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PLTF | |
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF REQUIREMENT FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | MEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT -PROCEEDINGS WERE ADJOURNED AND MEDIATION HEARING IS CONTINUED, TO BE RESET UPON AGREEMENT OF COUNSEL | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT BY PLT F | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT (DEFT THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY CO OF CONNECTICUTS) | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE - 08-30-21, 1:30PM, ZOOM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.