Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Shaw'S Southern Belle Frozen Foods, Inc., filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Major, Robert Patrick, against Certain Underwriters At Lloyds London, General Security Indemnity Company Of Arizona, Hdi Global Specialty Se F K A International Insurance Company Of Hannover Se, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, (total of 9) See All represented by Swindoll, Alan Henry, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with WILKINSON, GARY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWILKINSON, GARY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 22, 2020 |
CategoryInsurance Claims Division: Cv-G |
Last RefreshedApril 06, 2022 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF REQUIREMENT FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN | |
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (DEFT.'S SECOND) TO RESPOND TO PLTF.'S COMPLAINT OTHER | |
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER ON DEFTS. MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTF. COMPLAINT (AGREED) | |
November 19, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (DEFT'S) FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTF'S COMPLAINT | |
November 19, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ALAN SWINDOLL FOR CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON, INDIAN HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY, QBE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, STEADFAST INSURANCE COMPANY, GENERAL SECURITY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF ARIZONA, UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY, PRINCETON EXCESS AND SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPA, AND HDI GLOBAL SPECIALTY SE F/K/A INTERNATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF HANNOVER SE | |
November 11, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON QBE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY VIA ELECTRONIC DELIVERY 11/02/2020 BY CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER | |
November 11, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON PRINCETON EXCESS AND SURPLUS INSURANCE COMPANY VIA ELECTRONIC DELIVERY 11/02/2020 BY CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER | |
November 11, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON GENERAL SPECIALTY INDEMINITY COMPANYOF ARIZONA VIA ELECTRONIC DELIVERY 11/02/2020 BY CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER | |
November 11, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON HDI GLOBAL SPECIALTY SE VIA ELECTRONIC DELIVERY 11/02/2020 BY CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.