Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Caliber Trust Rentals Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Carey, Richard Brian, against Dan Demery, The Merry Mart Llc, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with FORECLOSURE JUDGE, presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFORECLOSURE JUDGE, Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 22, 2020 |
CategoryHomestead Residential Foreclosure - $0 - $50,000 Division: Fc-G |
Last RefreshedSeptember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
This complaint is filed by Caliber Trust Rentals, LLC against The Merry Mart, LLC and Dan Demery. Caliber is the payee, holder, and lender under a Mortgage and Promissory Note. The Merry Mart, LLC is the maker, debtor, and borrower under the Promisso...
ORDER DISMISSING THIS CASE
Date: June 02, 2022MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ( PLAINTIFF'S ) OF FORECLOSURE
Date: May 23, 2022MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT
Date: March 23, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 02, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER DISMISSING THIS CASE | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ( PLAINTIFF'S ) OF FORECLOSURE | |
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT RESCHEDULE 05/27/2022 9:00 AM - REMOTE VIA VIDEO CONFERENCE PER JUDGES CALENDAR 04/21/2022 | |
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 4-21-22 @ 9 AM IN CR 510 VIA ZOOM | |
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 04/21/2022 9:00 AM - REMOTE VIA VIDEO CONFERENCE | |
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT | |
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED | |
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING ON 8-10-21 @ 10:30 AM VIA ZOOM | |
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO AMOUNTS DUE & OWING (PLAINTIFF'S) | |
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.