Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Viles & Beckman, Llc, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Viles, Marcus Way, against George Deshane Marshall, Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, Memorial Healthcare Group, Inc., D B A Memorial, Rawlings Financial Services, Llc, Shands Jacksonville Medical Center, Inc., (total of 8) See All represented by Kaine, Evan Lyle, Kelley, Devry Rene, Martin, Francys Calle, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with DEES, ROBERT M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDEES, ROBERT M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 21, 2020 |
CategoryOther Negligence - Third Party Indemnification Division: Cv-C |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
COMPLAINT -ACTION FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT
Date: October 21, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE -PLTF | |
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION CASE MNGT PLAN | |
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $25,382.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4105727 | |
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS $11,610.29 TO: UF HEALTH JACKSONVILLE | |
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS $13,389.71 TO: GEORGE DESHANE MARSHALL | |
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM TO CASHIER DEPOSITED INTO REGISTRY $25,000.00 - CLERK'S FEE OF $382.50 | |
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER ON PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO DEPOSIT FUNDS INTO THE COURT REGISTRY AND DISMISS VILES & BECKMAN, LLC, DEFENDANT SHANDS JACKSONVILLE MEDICAL CENTER, TNC.’S MOTION TO DISBURSE FUNDS FROM THE REGISTRY OF THE COURT AND DEFENDANT GEORGE DESHANE MARSHALL’S MOTION TO DISBURSE FUNDS FROM THE REGISTRY OF THE COURT | |
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DISBURSEMENT OF REGISTRY FUNDS - DEFT GEORGE MARSHAL | |
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING ON 02/24/22 @ 1030AM VIA ZOOM | |
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING ON 02/24/22 @ 1015AM VIA ZOOM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.