Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company As Trustee F, filed a(n) case represented by Anthousis, Julie, Gonzalez, Miguel Antonio, against David A Lee, Unknown Spouse Of David A Lee A K A David Lee, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts with FORECLOSURE JUDGE, presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFORECLOSURE JUDGE, Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
|
Last RefreshedApril 02, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | RECEIPT NUMBER 3586960 HAD A REFUND OF $140.00 AMOUNT SENT TO BROCK AND SCOTT PLLC | |
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $926.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3586960 | |
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | RECEIPT NUMBER 3586960 REVISED | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS MAILED TO ATTORNEY - BROCK & SCOTT, PLLC -IN FEDEX EXPRESS ENVELOPE- TRACKING#: 7912 1158 4790 | |
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | CANCELLED CASE MANAGEMENT RESCHEDULE ON 12/8/2021 9:00:00 AM | |
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | > CANCEL REASON - CASE DISMISSED | |
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING ORDER DISMISSING CASE | |
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | POSTAGE PAID ENVELOPE REQUIRED FOR RETURN OF ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS | |
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION, DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE, CANCELING NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS, DIRECTING CLERK TO RETURN ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS AND TO SUBSTITUTE PHOTOSTATIC COPIES IN THE COURT FILE BOOK 20038 PAGE 2068-2069 | |
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $50.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4029319 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.