Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Bankunited Na, filed a(n) case represented by Delaney, Suzanne Victoria, against Cohen Lairsey, Greenfield Lakes Owners Association Inc, Parrot Solar Inc, Roxana Kaiser, Unknown Spouse Of Cohen Lairsey, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with FORECLOSURE JUDGE, presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFORECLOSURE JUDGE, Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 13, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
CASE FEES PAID: $993.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3586883
Date: September 10, 2021RECEIPT NUMBER 3586883 HAD A REFUND OF $140.00 AMOUNT SENT TO STOREY LAW GROUP, P.A.
Date: September 10, 2021MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ONE PAGE)
Date: February 21, 2020REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE
Date: October 01, 2020NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 7-22-2020 @ 10:30AM
Date: July 06, 2020CERTIFICATE OF MAILING -ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: March 10, 2020DEFAULT AGAINST ROXANA KAISER
Date: February 24, 2020DEFAULT AGAINST PARROT SOLAR, INC AND GREENFIELD LAKES OWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.
Date: February 20, 2020ANSWER FROM COHEN LAIRSEY
Date: February 19, 2020CERTIFICATE OF MAILING ; ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: February 18, 2020CASE FEES PAID: $1,133.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3586883
Date: December 31, 2019VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM
Date: December 31, 2019SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE (CORP) PARROT SOLAR INC ON 1-9-20 @ 6:15 PM
Date: January 31, 2020NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 19058 PAGE 126-126
Date: December 31, 2019FACT INFORMATION SHEET
Date: December 31, 2019CERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE
Date: December 31, 2019COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED - ROXANA KAISER
Date: December 31, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $993.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3586883 | |
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | RECEIPT NUMBER 3586883 HAD A REFUND OF $140.00 AMOUNT SENT TO STOREY LAW GROUP, P.A. | |
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | RECEIPT NUMBER 3586883 REVISED | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 19890 PAGE 2249-2249 | |
November 04, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION TO PLACE CASE ON INACTIVE STATUS | |
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE | |
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event | NON-JURY TRIAL 12/16/2020 10:30 AM - 510 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202 | |
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 7-22-2020 @ 10:30AM | |
May 12, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING ; JULY 22, 2020 @ 10:30 AM RM 510 | |
March 10, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING -ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.