Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Belmudez, Sean Paul, Mclain, Robert A, against Mary F Stevens, Ricky D Stevens, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with FORECLOSURE JUDGE, presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFORECLOSURE JUDGE, Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryHomestead Residential Foreclosure - $50,001 - $249,999 Division: Fc-G |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
AUCTION RESULTS
Date: January 14, 2021PROOF OF PUBLICATION - NOTICE OF SALE - 01/14/21 11AM
Date: January 07, 2021NOTICE OF SALE 01/14/2021 11:00 AM
Date: December 29, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED TO DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY BK 19558 PG 1795 2019CA1460 | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | AUCTION RESULTS | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | CONDUCT SALE-FEE PD-BID BY PLTF-CERTIFICATE OF SALE AND PROOF - BID AMNT: $82,700.00 BOOK 19540 PAGE 581-582 | |
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION - NOTICE OF SALE - 01/14/21 11AM | |
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE 01/14/2021 11:00 AM | |
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE | |
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE 01/14/2021 11 AM BOOK 19514 PAGE 778-784 | |
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event | UNABLE TO ISSUE NOS NONE PROVIDED TO CLERK WITH JUDGMENT | |
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event | CLERKS MEMORANDUM OF TRIAL | |
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event | FILED IN BOX # 200 ( NOTE AND MORTGAGE ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.