Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Anthony Conrad Beeks, filed a(n) case against Baptist Minister'S Conference Of Duval And Adjacent Counties, Darien K Bolden, Sr, Disciples Of Christ Christian Fellowship Missionary Baptist Church, Edward Norman Jr, Emanuel Missionary Baptist Church, (total of 29) See All represented by Bivens, Burnice, Jean-Bart, Leslie Scott, Peoples-Waters, Rhonda Denise, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with Roberson, Eric presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRoberson, Eric Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2019 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DISTRICT COURT (FEE OUTSTANDING) BOOK 19366 PAGE 312-314
Date: September 10, 2020NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DISTRICT COURT (FEE OUTSTANDING) - DUPLICATE
Date: September 10, 2020MOTION TO DISMISS (AMENDED) WITH PREJUDICE
Date: April 03, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 20, 2020 | Docket Event | DCA ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL ; 1D20-2683 | |
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event | DCA ORDER DIRECTING APPELLANT TO FILE COPIES OF THE ORDER(S) FROM WHICH THE APPEAL IS BEING TAKEN; 1D20-2683 | |
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event | DCA ACKNOWLEDGMENT RECEIPT ; 1D20-2683 | |
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event | DCA ORDER DIRECTING APPELLANT TO PAY FILING FEE OR FILE AN ORDER OF INSOLVENCY; 1D20-2683 | |
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event | RECORD OF APPEAL - NON-PAYMENT OF FILING FEE LETTER ; 1D20-2683 | |
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DISTRICT COURT (FEE OUTSTANDING) BOOK 19366 PAGE 312-314 | |
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DISTRICT COURT (FEE OUTSTANDING) - DUPLICATE | |
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
April 03, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS (AMENDED) WITH PREJUDICE | |
April 03, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 08-12-20, 11:15 AM, RM 712 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.