Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
James W Martin, filed a(n) Civil Complaint - Not Otherwise Coded (Use On Cases Prior To 2010). Division: Cv-E case against Dept Of Highway Safety & Motor Vehicles, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with SCHEMER, JACK M. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSCHEMER, JACK M. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2009 |
CategoryCivil Complaint - Not Otherwise Coded (Use On Cases Prior To 2010). Division: Cv-E |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 17, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER GRT PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI | |
April 13, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY | |
March 31, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION TO ABATE PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI & REMAND FOR FURTHER PROCEEDINGS/RESPONDENT/ATTY FED EX | |
March 30, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY ATTY/PET | |
March 30, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ORAL ARGUMENT PREVIOUS FOR 04/07/09 @3:40PM IS RESCHEDULED FOR 04/09/09 @ 11:30A.M. RM-224 | |
March 16, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING ORAL ARGUMENT BEFORE THE COURT | |
March 09, 2009 | Docket Event | REPLY TO DEPT RESPONSE TO PET FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI | |
March 09, 2009 | Docket Event | APPENDIX INDEX (SUPPLEMENTAL) | |
March 09, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ORAL ARGUMENT | |
February 18, 2009 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI/RESPONDENT/ATTY FED EX |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.