Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Roy T. Gill Jr, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with TAYLOR, L. HALDANE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTAYLOR, L. HALDANE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2009 |
CategoryForeclosure (Use On Cases Prior To 2010) Division: Cv-C |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 21, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $4.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 774929 | |
August 21, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $130.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 774537 | |
August 18, 2009 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED TO: FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION BOOK 14976 PAGE 552-553 | |
August 18, 2009 | Docket Event | ASSIGNMENT OF BID ISSUED TO: FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION BOOK 14976 PAGE 477-478 | |
August 18, 2009 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
August 04, 2009 | Docket Event | THIRD PARTY BID SHEET | |
August 04, 2009 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE BID $17,000.00 BOOK 14961 PAGE 745-746 | |
July 17, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE 08/04/2009 11:00 AM A PART OF THE SOUTHEAST 1/4 OF THE SOUTHEAST 1/4 OF SECTION 9, TOWNSHIP 1 SOUTH, RANGE 26 EAST BEING MORE PARTICULARLY DESCRIBED AS FOLLOWS: COMMENCE AT THE INTERSECTION OF THE EAST LINE OF SAID SECTION 9 WITH THE N | |
July 01, 2009 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
July 01, 2009 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 14943 PAGE 1773-1778 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.