Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Indymac Federal Bank Fsb, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Griffith, Scott Alan, against Bessie Matthews, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Incorporated, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with FORECLOSURE JUDGE, presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFORECLOSURE JUDGE, Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2009 |
CategoryForeclosure (Use On Cases Prior To 2010) Division: Fc-B |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 14, 2013 | Docket Event | VERIFIED AND IMAGED | |
August 12, 2013 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS MAILED TO ATTORNEY RONALD R. WOLFE & ASSOCIATES ON 8/12/13 | |
March 11, 2013 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM -DISMISSED AFTER HEARING | |
March 11, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME, FLORIDA DEFAULT LAW GROUP TO RONALD R. WOLFE AND ASSOCIATES | |
March 11, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER DISMISSING CASE, CANCELLING FORECLOSURE SALE, CANCELLING NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS, SETTING ASIDE FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DIRECTING CLERK TO RETURN ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS AND TO SUBSTITUTE PHOTOSTATIC COPIES IN THE COURT FILE BOOK 16293 PAGE 1983-1 | |
March 07, 2013 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $50.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 1784586 | |
March 04, 2013 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER DISMISSING CASE, CANCELLING FORECLOSURE SALE, CANCELLING NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS, AND SETTING ASIDE FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DIRECTING CLERK TO RETURN ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS AND TO SUBSTITUTE PHOTOSTATIC COPIES IN THE COURT FILE | |
July 13, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER CANCELLING FORECLOSURE SALE BOOK 15304 PAGE 699-700 | |
July 12, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $50.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 1050287 | |
July 12, 2010 | Docket Event | MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.