Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Wachovia Dealer Services.,, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Walters, Alison Verges, against Mirsada Turkanovic, Mustafa Turkanovic, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with DAY, LANCE M. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDAY, LANCE M. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2008 |
CategoryComplaint On Contract Or Other Debt (Use On Cases Prior To 2010). Division: Cv-G |
Last RefreshedDecember 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION (THIRD-PARTY DEFT'S) TO SEVER/BIFURCATE | |
March 16, 2011 | Docket Event | REOPEN ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED ADMIN ORDER 2011-02 | |
March 15, 2010 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF CONTINUING FINAL GARNISHMENT JUDGMENT | |
October 15, 2009 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FROM MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA | |
October 15, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (UNVERIFIED TO FIRST) | |
September 25, 2009 | Docket Event | SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY ISSUED FOR: MIRSADA TURKANOVIC BK#3:09-BK-08006 (ORIGINAL) | |
August 19, 2009 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM TO CASHIER $100.00 TO: DENNIS LEVINE & ASSOCIATES,/PILOT CORPORATION OF AMERICA/CK # 16846, AUG 25, 09 | |
August 19, 2009 | Docket Event | CONTINUING JUDGMENT IN GARNISHMENT FOR SALARY OR WAGES BOOK 14978 PAGE 383-384 | |
August 13, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ENTRY OF CONTINUING FINAL GARNISHMENT JUDGMENT | |
August 04, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO AMOUNTS DUE & OWING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.