Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Greenfield, John Calvin, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Cormier, Jordan Elizabeth, in the jurisdiction of Dixie County, FL, . Dixie County, FL Superior Courts with FEAGLE, MARK EDWARD presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFEAGLE, MARK EDWARD Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 21, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDixie County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
October 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 12/19/2023 at 1000 AM, VZ - Judge MARK FEAGLE presiding. | |
October 11, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION AND NOTICE OF HEARING 12/19/2023 @ 10AM | |
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER AUTHORIZING INTERVENTION AND TRANSFER OF CASE FOR DETERMINATION OF CHILD SUPPORT BY THE CHILD SUPPORT HEARING OFFICER | |
November 23, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION DORS MOTION TO INTERVENE AND TRANSFER CASE FOR DETERMINATION OF CHILD SUPPORT BY THE CHILD SUPPORT HEARING OFFICER | |
November 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Designation of Email | |
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM CASE MANGER | |
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM CASE MANAGER | |
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event | RESPONDENT'S DRIVER LICENSE- ISSUE DATE 10/07/2020 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.