Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Roberts, John David, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Roberts, Colleen, in the jurisdiction of Dixie County, FL, . Dixie County, FL Superior Courts with FEAGLE, MARK EDWARD presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFEAGLE, MARK EDWARD Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 13, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 05, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDixie County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | VITAL STATISTICS | |
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 9/15/2022 at 1030 AM, VZ - Judge MARK FEAGLE presiding. | |
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED ORDER SETTING HEARING VIDEOCONFERNCING 09/15/2022 @ 10:30AM | |
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 9/27/2022 at 0900 AM, VZ - Judge Debbie DeNike presiding. | |
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING 09/27/2022 @ 9:00AM | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFAULT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.