Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Smith, Jessica, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Smith, Dakota, in the jurisdiction of Dixie County, FL, . Dixie County, FL Superior Courts with FEAGLE, MARK EDWARD presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFEAGLE, MARK EDWARD Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 01, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 05, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDixie County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
July 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
July 27, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONCLUSION OF REPRESENTATION | |
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 07/26/2022 @ 4:00PM | |
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Event FINAL HEARING scheduled on 7/26/2022 at 0400 PM, VZ - Judge MARK FEAGLE presiding. | |
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 07/26/2022 @ 4:00PM | |
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION | |
June 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Defense Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO | |
June 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment received: $408.00 Receipt Number MX 2022001916 | |
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Case 152022DR000119DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/1/2022 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.