Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Swann, Matthew Edward, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ice, Elizabeth, in the jurisdiction of Dixie County, FL, . Dixie County, FL Superior Courts with FEAGLE, MARK EDWARD presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFEAGLE, MARK EDWARD Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 16, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 05, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDixie County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF PATERNITY | |
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Event FINAL HEARING scheduled on 10/24/2022 at 1030 AM, VZ - Judge MARK FEAGLE presiding. | |
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 10/24/2022 @ 10:30AM | |
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT | |
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event | PARENTING PLAN | |
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (SHORT FORM) | |
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment received: $120.00 Receipt Number MX 2022002954 | |
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event | RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT | |
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment received: $120.00 Receipt Number MX 2022002654 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.