Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Folsom, Walter Lee, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Webb, Jessica Marie, in the jurisdiction of Dixie County, FL, . Dixie County, FL Superior Courts with FEAGLE, MARK EDWARD presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFEAGLE, MARK EDWARD Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 11, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDixie County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT OF PATERNITY | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING OFFICE OF CONFLICT COUNSEL | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF PATERNITY | |
July 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
July 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 7/26/2022 at 0900 AM, VZ - Judge MARK FEAGLE presiding. | |
July 22, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 07/26/2022 @ 9:00AM | |
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event | ** INCORRECT FILING ** RESPONDENT DID NOT WANT COUNTER PETITION ** ANSWER TO PETITION AND COUNTERPETITION TO DETERMINE PATERNITY FOR RELATED RELIEF | |
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO PETITION TO DETERMINE PATERNITY AND FOR RELATED RELIEF | |
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event | PARENTING PLAN | |
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN(S) OF SERVICE - SERVED JESSICA WEBB ON 06/06/2022 @ 8:31AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.