Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Bank Of America, N.A., filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Pasqualone, Joshua David, against Coppock, Joel S, Coppock, Mario A, Dixie County Florida A Politic, Unknown Party 1, Unknown Party 2, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Dixie County, FL, . Dixie County, FL Superior Courts with JOHNSON, JENNIFER JONES presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJOHNSON, JENNIFER JONES Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 16, 2022 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedDecember 26, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDixie County, FL |
|
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: June 16, 2022RETURN(S) OF SERVICE (JOEL COPPOCK)
Date: August 31, 2022COMPLAINT FILED
Date: June 16, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CANCEL JUNE 27, 2023 FORECLOSURE SALE, VACATE FINAL JUDGEMENT, DISMISS CAUSE ACTION AND RETURN ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE | |
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Letter Returning Loan Documents | |
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO CANCEL JUNE 27,2023 FORECLOSURE SALE AND VACATE FINAL JUGMENT AND DISMISS CAUSE OF ACTION | |
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT COPPOCKS MOTION TO CANCEL JUDICIAL FORECLOSURE SALE AND RESCHEDULING SAME | |
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received: $103.00 Receipt Number MX 2023001422 | |
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT | |
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.